KS SB125 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Substitute for SB 125 by Committee on Taxation - Providing for county treasurers to establish a payment plan and waive interest and penalties for late tax payments and providing for the abatement of taxes for agricultural improvement, public grain warehouse and commercial real property destroyed or substantially destroyed by natural disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Substitute for SB 125 by Committee on Taxation - Providing for county treasurers to establish a payment plan and waive interest and penalties for late tax payments and providing for the abatement of taxes for agricultural improvement, public grain warehouse and commercial real property destroyed or substantially destroyed by natural disaster.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 29 Nay: 11 (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Died on House Calendar
2020-05-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
2019-04-03HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, April 3, 2019, 3:00 PM Room 582-N
2019-03-21HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2019-03-21HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-20SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 29 Nay: 11
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-02-19SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-02-08SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-02-07SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback