KS SB124 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Thursday, 19 May 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Thursday, 19 May 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the Lower Smoky Hill water supply access program, water rights conservation program abandonment, multi-year water flex accounts and the Arkansas river gaging fund.
Title
Relating to the Lower Smoky Hill water supply access program, water rights conservation program abandonment, multi-year water flex accounts and the Arkansas river gaging fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Approved by Governor on Thursday, 19 May 2011 | |
2011-05-12 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 13, 2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 | |
2011-05-04 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2011-05-03 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 | |
2011-05-03 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2011-05-02 | Conference committee report now available | |
2011-03-23 | Motion to accede adopted; Representative Powell, Representative Kerschen and Representative Williams appointed as conferees | |
2011-03-23 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Ostmeyer , Senator McGinn and Senator Francisco as conferees | |
2011-03-22 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 2 | |
2011-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2011-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-03-11 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-25 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-24 | Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2011-02-24 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2011-02-24 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-02-22 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Natural Resources | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to Committee on Natural Resources | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced |