KS SB121 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Robert G. (Bob) Bethell joint committee on home and community based services and KanCare oversight; members and meetings.
Title
Robert G. (Bob) Bethell joint committee on home and community based services and KanCare oversight; members and meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 30 Nay: 10 (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 27 (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 27 (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 16, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 546S |
2015-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 30 Nay: 10 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was rejected Yea: 11 Nay: 27 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kelly |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate Introduced |