KS SB12 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Kansas department for children and families to implement performance-based contracts.
Title
Requiring the Kansas department for children and families to implement performance-based contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 5 (Y: 117 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 0 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 0 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Conference |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Senator Olson, Senator Hilderbrand, and Senator Faust-Goudeau are appointed to replace Senator Hilderbrand, Senator Gossage, and Senator Pettey on the Conference Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | House Representative Barker, Representative Eplee, and Representative Highberger are appointed to replace Representative Concannon, Representative Esau, and Representative Ousley on the Conference Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Concannon, Representative Esau and Representative Ousley appointed as conferees |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Hilderbrand , Senator Gossage and Senator Pettey as conferees |
2022-03-23 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 5 |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Children and Seniors |
2022-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 8, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2022-02-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2022-02-18 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 3, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, January 7, 2021 |