KS SB117 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requirements for the treatment and transportation of diseased dogs and cats.
Title
Requirements for the treatment and transportation of diseased dogs and cats.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 12, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb117/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb117_00_0000.pdf |