KS SB113 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Senate The Legislature having adjourned sine die on April 28, 2023, there was no opportunity to reconsider and the line-item vetoes are sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Senate The Legislature having adjourned sine die on April 28, 2023, there was no opportunity to reconsider and the line-item vetoes are sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 113 by Committee on K-12 Education Budget - Making appropriations for the department of education for FY 23, FY 24 and FY 25; establishing the mental health intervention team program; authorizing certain students to participate in activities regulated by the Kansas state high school activities association; requiring school districts to post certain enrollment and academic information on school district websites; revising school district open-enrollment procedures; authorizing local school board members to receive compensation from their school district; authorizing current-year student enrollment for determinations of state foundation aid; continuing the 20 mill statewide tax levy for schools; amending the school districts that qualify for and the amount that school districts are able to levy pursuant to the cost-of-living weighting.
Title
House Substitute for SB 113 by Committee on K-12 Education Budget - Making appropriations for the department of education for FY 23, FY 24 and FY 25; establishing the mental health intervention team program; authorizing certain students to participate in activities regulated by the Kansas state high school activities association; requiring school districts to post certain enrollment and academic information on school district websites; revising school district open-enrollment procedures; authorizing local school board members to receive compensation from their school district; authorizing current-year student enrollment for determinations of state foundation aid; continuing the 20 mill statewide tax levy for schools; amending the school districts that qualify for and the amount that school districts are able to levy pursuant to the cost-of-living weighting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 23 Nay: 16 (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 83 Nay: 37 (Y: 83 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 75 Nay: 48 (Y: 75 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Probst was rejected - Yea: 49 Nay: 72 (Y: 49 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-03-22 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Poskin was rejected - Yea: 39 Nay: 82 (Y: 39 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 83 Nay: 37 (Y: 83 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 75 Nay: 48 (Y: 75 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Probst was rejected - Yea: 49 Nay: 72 (Y: 49 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-03-22 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Poskin was rejected - Yea: 39 Nay: 82 (Y: 39 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Senate | Senate The Legislature having adjourned sine die on April 28, 2023, there was no opportunity to reconsider and the line-item vetoes are sustained. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor except line item veto of 1(c); 2(a) (part); 14; 21 (part) on Thursday, May 18, 2023 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 8, 2023 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 23 Nay: 16 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2023-04-28 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 83 Nay: 37 |
2023-04-28 | House | House Conference Committee Report challenged by Rep. Ousley under Joint Rule 3(f), ruled to be in order. |
2023-04-28 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2023-04-28 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2023-04-27 | House | House Representative Winn is appointed to replace Representative Poskin on the Conference Committee |
2023-04-24 | House | House Representative Poskin is appointed to replace Representative Winn on the Conference Committee |
2023-04-06 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as second conferees |
2023-04-06 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Williams, K., Representative Landwehr and Representative Winn appointed as second conferees |
2023-04-06 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2023-04-03 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Williams, K., Representative Landwehr and Representative Winn appointed as conferees |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Baumgardner , Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes as conferees |
2023-03-23 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 75 Nay: 48 |
2023-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2023-03-22 | House | House Representative Williams, K. challenged the amendment under the Pay-Go provision of House Rule 2110. The amendment was ruled to be out of order |
2023-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Clifford |
2023-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Probst was rejected Yea: 49 Nay: 72 |
2023-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Probst |
2023-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Poskin was rejected Yea: 39 Nay: 82 |
2023-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Poskin |
2023-03-22 | House | House Representative Landwehr challenged the amendment under the Pay-Go provision of House Rule 2110. The amendment was ruled to be out of order |
2023-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Poskin |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2023-03-07 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 7, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 546-S |
2023-03-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2023-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2023-03-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, February 17, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate Introduced |