KS SB113 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Senate Hearing continuation: Friday, March 15, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for the legal use of medical cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the legal use of medical cannabis.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateSenate Hearing continuation: Friday, March 15, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
2019-03-14SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
2019-02-07SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-02-06SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback