KS SB113 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the legal use of medical cannabis.
Title
Providing for the legal use of medical cannabis.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Holland [D] | Sen. John Doll [R] | Sen. Oletha Faust-Goudeau [D] | Sen. Marci Francisco [D] |
Sen. David Haley [D] | Sen. Tom Hawk [D] | Rep. Vic Miller [D] | Sen. Pat Pettey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Friday, March 15, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb113/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb113_00_0000.pdf |