KS SB112 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Senate No motion to reconsider line item vetoes; Vetoes sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Senate No motion to reconsider line item vetoes; Vetoes sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 112 by Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security - Expedited professional state credentialing for military servicemembers and nonresident military spouses.
Title
House Substitute for SB 112 by Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security - Expedited professional state credentialing for military servicemembers and nonresident military spouses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 23 Nay: 11 (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 64 Nay: 48 (Y: 64 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 64 Nay: 48 (Y: 64 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | Senate | Senate No motion to reconsider line item vetoes; Vetoes sustained |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor except line item veto of Sections 142(f) and 143(f) on Tuesday, June 16, 2015 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Thursday, June 11, 2015 |
2015-06-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 23 Nay: 11 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 64 Nay: 48 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Masterson, Senator Denning and Senator Kelly appointed as second conferees |
2015-06-02 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Ryckman, Representative Schwartz and Representative Henry appointed as second conferees |
2015-06-02 | House | House Representative Henry replaces Representative Carmichael on the Conference Committee |
2015-06-02 | House | House Representative Schwartz replaces Representative Macheers on the Conference Committee |
2015-06-02 | House | House Representative Ryckman replaces Representative Barker on the Conference Committee |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Senate Senator Kelly replaces Senator Pettey on the Conference Committee |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Senate Senator Denning replaces Senator Smith on the Conference Committee |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Senate Senator Masterson replaces Senator King on the Conference Committee |
2015-05-21 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Senate Senator Pettey replaces Senator Haley on the Conference Committee |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-05-11 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Macheers and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator King , Senator Smith and Senator Haley as conferees |
2015-05-07 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2015-05-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2015-05-07 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-05-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security |
2015-04-29 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Rereferred to Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security |
2015-03-25 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security |
2015-03-16 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security |
2015-03-10 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112N |
2015-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 19, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate Introduced |