KS SB107 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the attorney general to establish a system of legal representation charges and collect such charges from state agencies.
Title
Authorizing the attorney general to establish a system of legal representation charges and collect such charges from state agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Introduced |