KS SB104 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a court order be issued directing a child to remain in a present or future placement for certain children in need of care.
Title
Requiring a court order be issued directing a child to remain in a present or future placement for certain children in need of care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 28 Nay: 9 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 28 Nay: 9 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 9, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Introduced |