KS SB102 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - House Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the Kansas closed case task force, pertaining to identification and investigation of hits to the combined DNA index system (CODIS) in closed cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the Kansas closed case task force, pertaining to identification and investigation of hits to the combined DNA index system (CODIS) in closed cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-22HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-21SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 38 Nay: 1
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2019-03-11SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-08SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-02-19SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-06SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-05SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback