KS S1617 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-9)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-9)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died on General Orders in House
Summary
Expanded rail service; Kansas City to Fort Worth, Texas; congratulating Kansas Department of Transportation and others; urging action. Effective date: Upon Adoption.
Title
Expanded rail service; Kansas City to Fort Worth, Texas; congratulating Kansas Department of Transportation and others; urging action. Effective date: Upon Adoption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died on General Orders in House | |
2009-04-03 | Referred to COW -HJ 569 | |
2009-04-02 | Received and introduced -HJ 519 | |
2009-04-01 | CR: Be adptd by Transportation -SJ 581; Referred to COW -SJ 582; Motion to advance to first order of business -SJ 582; COW: Be adptd -SJ 587; EFA: Adptd; Yeas 36 Nays 3 -SJ 587 | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Transportation -SJ 478 | |
2009-03-23 | Introduced -SJ 410 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |