KS S0530 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Repeal of all sales tax exemptions. Effective date: 6/30/2011 & St Bk.
Title
Repeal of all sales tax exemptions. Effective date: 6/30/2011 & St Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-03-08 | Withdrawn from Ways and Means -SJ 1140; Rereferred to Assessment and Taxation -SJ 1140 | |
2010-03-04 | Withdrawn from Assessment and Taxation -SJ 1129; Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 1129 | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Assessment and Taxation -SJ 993 | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced -SJ 987 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |