KS S0093 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Summary
Joint committee on special claims against the state; membership, qualifications, number. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Joint committee on special claims against the state; membership, qualifications, number. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in House committee | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Judiciary -HJ 367 | |
2009-03-20 | Received and introduced -HJ 351 | |
2009-03-19 | Engrossed -SJ 362; FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 359 | |
2009-03-18 | COW: Be am.; be passed as am. -SJ 349 | |
2009-02-03 | CR: Be passed & placed on consent calendar by Ways and Means -SJ 109; Withdrawn from consent calendar; placed on general orders -SJ 109 | |
2009-01-27 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 67 | |
2009-01-26 | Introduced -SJ 59 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |