KS S0013 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Restrictions on qualifications for Kansas bioscience authority board members. Effective date: KS Reg.
Title
Restrictions on qualifications for Kansas bioscience authority board members. Effective date: KS Reg.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to Federal and State Affairs -SJ 33 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced -SJ 9 | |
2009-01-07 | Prefiled for introduction |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |