KS HR6045 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Enrolled on Monday, April 8, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Enrolled on Monday, April 8, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approving an amendment to the gaming compact with the Iowa Tribe of Kansas and Nebraska concerning sports wagering.
Title
Approving an amendment to the gaming compact with the Iowa Tribe of Kansas and Nebraska concerning sports wagering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 101 Nay: 20 (Y: 101 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | House Enrolled on Monday, April 8, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 101 Nay: 20 |
2024-04-01 | House | House Referred to Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-01 | House | House Introduced |