KS HR6027 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Enrolled on Tuesday, May 10, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Enrolled on Tuesday, May 10, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging modifications to the National Broadband Plan.
Title
A RESOLUTION urging modifications to the National Broadband Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-06 - House - House Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 116 Nay: 0 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - House Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 116 Nay: 0 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - House Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 116 Nay: 0 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Enrolled on Tuesday, May 10, 2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 116 Nay: 0 | |
2011-05-03 | Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Energy and Utilities | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities | |
2011-05-02 | Introduced |