KS HR6024 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 96-29)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - House Enrolled on Monday, May 18, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 96-29)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - House Enrolled on Monday, May 18, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging the state-wide celebration of Dwight D. Eisenhower's 125th birthday.
Title
Encouraging the state-wide celebration of Dwight D. Eisenhower's 125th birthday.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | House | House Enrolled on Monday, May 18, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2015-05-06 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hr6024/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hr6024_enrolled.pdf |