KS HR6017 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - House Enrolled on Wednesday, March 18, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - House Enrolled on Wednesday, March 18, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designating March 12, 2015, as Kidney Awareness Day.
Title
Designating March 12, 2015, as Kidney Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Finney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | House Enrolled on Wednesday, March 18, 2015 |
2015-03-12 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2015-03-12 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hr6017/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hr6017_enrolled.pdf |