KS HR6015 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - Emergency Final Action - Not adopted; Yea: 59 Nay: 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - Emergency Final Action - Not adopted; Yea: 59 Nay: 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution; requiring Attorney General to bring suit to test constitutionality of a provision of Kansas Expanded Lottery Act.
Title
Resolution; requiring Attorney General to bring suit to test constitutionality of a provision of Kansas Expanded Lottery Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Not adopted - Yea: 59 Nay: 62 (Y: 59 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-28 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended - Yea: 63 Nay: 59 (Y: 63 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Not adopted - Yea: 59 Nay: 62 (Y: 59 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-28 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended - Yea: 63 Nay: 59 (Y: 63 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended - Yea: 63 Nay: 59 (Y: 63 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Not adopted - Yea: 59 Nay: 62 (Y: 59 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-28 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended - Yea: 63 Nay: 59 (Y: 63 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Emergency Final Action - Not adopted; Yea: 59 Nay: 62 | |
2011-04-28 | Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended Yea: 63 Nay: 59 | |
2011-04-28 | Amendment by Rep. Otto was ruled out of order as violating House Rule 1309. | |
2011-04-28 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Otto | |
2011-04-28 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-03-16 | Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2011-03-09 | Introduced |