KS HCR5014 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - House Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, March 31, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - House Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, March 31, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment that provides for legislative oversight of rules and regulations adopted by executive branch agencies and officials.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment that provides for legislative oversight of rules and regulations adopted by executive branch agencies and officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 27 Nay: 12 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 27 (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Adopted as amended by required 2/3 Majority - Yea: 85 Nay: 39 (Y: 85 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority - Yea: 80 Nay: 33 (Y: 80 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted - Yea: 77 Nay: 42 (Y: 77 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 27 (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Adopted as amended by required 2/3 Majority - Yea: 85 Nay: 39 (Y: 85 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority - Yea: 80 Nay: 33 (Y: 80 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted - Yea: 77 Nay: 42 (Y: 77 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 27 Nay: 12 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected Yea: 11 Nay: 27 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 2, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-02-21 | House | House Final Action - Adopted by required 2/3 majority; Yea: 85 Nay: 39 |
2022-02-21 | House | House Motion to Reconsider Adopted Yea: 85 Nay: 39 |
2022-02-17 | House | House Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority; Yea: 80 Nay: 33 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted Yea: 77 Nay: 42 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Representative Finch raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sawyer |
2022-02-16 | House | House Representative Finch raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Probst |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highberger was rejected |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Highberger |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by |
2021-03-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 22, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | House | House Introduced |