KS HCR5001 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - House Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, February 4, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopting joint rules for the House of Representatives and Senate for the 2021-2022 biennium.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting joint rules for the House of Representatives and Senate for the 2021-2022 biennium.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Adopted as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 5 (Y: 117 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, February 4, 2021
2021-01-28SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
2021-01-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted
2021-01-22HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, January 21, 2021
2021-01-22SenateSenate Referred to the Committee of the Whole
2021-01-22SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2021-01-21HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Adopted as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 5
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended
2021-01-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-01-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted as amended by Committee on Rules and Journal
2021-01-19HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, January 19, 2021, 12:00 PM Room 582-N
2021-01-11HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Rules and Journal
2021-01-11HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback