KS HB2786 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Moratorium on employer contributions to KPERS death and disability plan during fourth quarter of fiscal year 2012.
Title
Moratorium on employer contributions to KPERS death and disability plan during fourth quarter of fiscal year 2012.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died on Calendar | |
2012-03-28 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Pensions and Benefits | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Committee on Pensions and Benefits | |
2012-03-14 | Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/hb2786/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2786_00_0000.pdf |