KS HB2780 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - House Hearing: Tuesday, March 5, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - House Hearing: Tuesday, March 5, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring persons who file lawsuits for wrongful conviction compensation to prove additional information, changing the compensation rates to daily rates instead of yearly rates and limiting housing assistance offered to such persons.
Title
Requiring persons who file lawsuits for wrongful conviction compensation to prove additional information, changing the compensation rates to daily rates instead of yearly rates and limiting housing assistance offered to such persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 5, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2024-02-19 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-16 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-08 | House | House Introduced |