KS HB2774 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the employees of certain charitable organizations as eligible to participate in the state health care benefits program.
Title
Designating the employees of certain charitable organizations as eligible to participate in the state health care benefits program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2018-03-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2018-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 546-S |
2018-03-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2018-03-08 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2774/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2774_00_0000.pdf |