KS HB2761 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing an individual to itemize deductions in Kansas despite not itemizing on their federal return.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing an individual to itemize deductions in Kansas despite not itemizing on their federal return.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseHouse Died on Calendar
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation
2018-03-14HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S
2018-03-01HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2018-03-01HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback