KS HB2761 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual to itemize deductions in Kansas despite not itemizing on their federal return.
Title
Allowing an individual to itemize deductions in Kansas despite not itemizing on their federal return.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation |
2018-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2018-03-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2018-03-01 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2761/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2761_00_0000.pdf |