KS HB2761 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating references and corresponding changes relating to Executive Reorganization Order No. 40 and the Kansas department of agriculture.
Title
Updating references and corresponding changes relating to Executive Reorganization Order No. 40 and the Kansas department of agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 117 Nay: 5 (Y: 117 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Senate Committee | |
2012-03-28 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture | |
2012-03-27 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-03-21 | Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 117 Nay: 5 | |
2012-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-03-16 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 783 Docking | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced |