KS HB2759 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring veterinarians to submit information to the prescription monitoring program and providing for transfers of moneys from certain state agencies to the state board of pharmacy for operation and maintenance of the prescription monitoring program.
Title
Requiring veterinarians to submit information to the prescription monitoring program and providing for transfers of moneys from certain state agencies to the state board of pharmacy for operation and maintenance of the prescription monitoring program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 21, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 112-N |
2018-02-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-28 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2759/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2759_00_0000.pdf |