KS HB2758 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Board of accountancy, special litigation reserve fund, expenditures, transfers from fee fund.
Title
Board of accountancy, special litigation reserve fund, expenditures, transfers from fee fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 116 Nay: 2 (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died on Senate General Orders | |
2012-03-30 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-03-28 | Hearing: Thursday, March 29, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S | |
2012-03-13 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-03-12 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-03-09 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 2 | |
2012-03-09 | Engrossed on Thursday, 08 March 2012 | |
2012-03-08 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-03-08 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Budget | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing: Monday, March 05, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 142-S | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Budget | |
2012-02-20 | Introduced |