KS HB2751 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the office of the child advocate for children's protection and services within the Kansas department of administration.
Title
Establishing the office of the child advocate for children's protection and services within the Kansas department of administration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2018-03-20 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 20, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 218-N |
2018-03-08 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2018-02-15 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-02-15 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2751/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2751_00_0000.pdf |