KS HB2742 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the medical assistance recovery program.
Title
Relating to the medical assistance recovery program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Hearing: Monday, March 05, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-15 | Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-10 | Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/hb2742/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2742_00_0000.pdf |