KS HB2741 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Kansas family law code.
Title
Amending the Kansas family law code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Senate Committee | |
2012-03-28 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-27 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-03-26 | Engrossed on Monday, 26 March 2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kiegerl was withdrawn | |
2012-03-21 | Representative Brookens raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. | |
2012-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kiegerl | |
2012-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-08 | Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | |
2012-03-08 | Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-15 | Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-10 | Introduced |