KS HB2729 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring school districts to procure specific spend categories through the department of administration.
Title
Requiring school districts to procure specific spend categories through the department of administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Motion by Representative Hibbard to rerefer to Committee on Education Budget passed - Yea: 69 Nay: 52 (Y: 69 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in Committee |
2016-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion by Representative Hibbard to rerefer to Committee on Education Budget passed Yea: 69 Nay: 52 |
2016-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hutton was adopted |
2016-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hutton |
2016-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Grosserode was adopted |
2016-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Grosserode |
2016-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education Budget |
2016-03-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education Budget |
2016-03-10 | House | House Introduced |