KS HB2705 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the rebuttable presumption of an intent to distribute controlled substances and replacing it with a permissive inference.
Title
Removing the rebuttable presumption of an intent to distribute controlled substances and replacing it with a permissive inference.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2022-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2022-03-03 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 3, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2022-02-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2022-02-14 | House | House Introduced |