KS HB2702 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the Kansas taxpayer protection act; establishing notice and public hearing requirements prior to approval by a governing body to exceed its revenue neutral rate for the imposition of property tax and discontinuing the city and county tax lid; providing a waiver of interest and fees on certain delinquent property taxes for a period of time and delaying preparation of delinquent real estate tax list and notice; prohibiting valuation increase for real property solely as the result of normal repair, replacement or maintenance of existing structure; providing for county treasurers to establish a payment plan for the payment of delinquent or nondelinquent taxes; requiring the state board of tax appeals to serve orders and notices by electronic means if requested by the party; prohibiting county appraisers and the state board of tax appeals from increasing the valuation of county appraised property in valuation appeals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the Kansas taxpayer protection act; establishing notice and public hearing requirements prior to approval by a governing body to exceed its revenue neutral rate for the imposition of property tax and discontinuing the city and county tax lid; providing a waiver of interest and fees on certain delinquent property taxes for a period of time and delaying preparation of delinquent real estate tax list and notice; prohibiting valuation increase for real property solely as the result of normal repair, replacement or maintenance of existing structure; providing for county treasurers to establish a payment plan for the payment of delinquent or nondelinquent taxes; requiring the state board of tax appeals to serve orders and notices by electronic means if requested by the party; prohibiting county appraisers and the state board of tax appeals from increasing the valuation of county appraised property in valuation appeals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 89 Nay: 28 (Y: 89 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 2 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected - Yea: 40 Nay: 80 (Y: 40 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected - Yea: 44 Nay: 80 (Y: 44 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
2020-05-21HouseHouse Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Monday, June 1, 2020
2020-05-21HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 26, 2020
2020-05-21HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 89 Nay: 28
2020-05-21HouseHouse Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed
2020-05-21SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 2
2020-05-21SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2020-05-21HouseHouse Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Johnson, Representative Mason and Representative Gartner appointed as second conferees
2020-05-21SenateSenate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Kerschen and Senator Holland appointed as second conferees
2020-05-21HouseHouse Representative Johnson, Representative Mason, and Representative Gartner are appointed to replace Representative Tarwater, Representative Corbet, and Representative Frownfelter on the Conference Committee
2020-05-21SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Kerschen and Senator Holland appointed as conferees
2020-05-21SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2020-05-21HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Tarwater , Representative Corbet and Representative Frownfelter as conferees
2020-05-21HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2020-03-17SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2020-03-17SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2020-03-17SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2020-03-16SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce
2020-03-13SenateSenate Hearing: Friday, March 13, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
2020-03-05SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Commerce
2020-03-04SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2020-02-26HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 125 Nay: 0
2020-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2020-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected Yea: 40 Nay: 80
2020-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
2020-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected Yea: 44 Nay: 80
2020-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
2020-02-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2020-02-19HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 19, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
2020-02-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2020-02-14HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2702/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2702_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2702_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2702_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200226152207_640685/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200226152917_762929/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200226163250_487336/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200317181718_683848/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200521221813_785014/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200522010415_512243/

Bill Comments

feedback