KS HB2700 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending provisions concerning the abuse, neglect and financial exploitation of certain adults to update the list of mandatory reporters, create a definition of "financial exploitation" and increase the number of working days in which DCF must complete an initial investigation from 30 to 60 working days.
Title
Amending provisions concerning the abuse, neglect and financial exploitation of certain adults to update the list of mandatory reporters, create a definition of "financial exploitation" and increase the number of working days in which DCF must complete an initial investigation from 30 to 60 working days.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-03-16 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 16, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2020-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-14 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2700/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2700_00_0000.pdf |