KS HB2678 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the period for how long a groundwater right can be deposited in a water bank, requiring withdrawn water to be authorized by a water bank on or before December 1, requiring an evaluation of the central Kansas water bank by an independent consultant before July 1, 2025 and establishing a maximum length for a water bank charter extension.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the period for how long a groundwater right can be deposited in a water bank, requiring withdrawn water to be authorized by a water bank on or before December 1, requiring an evaluation of the central Kansas water bank by an independent consultant before July 1, 2025 and establishing a maximum length for a water bank charter extension.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 1 (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-29SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2024-02-28SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2024-02-28HouseHouse Engrossed on Friday, February 23, 2024
2024-02-22HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 1
2024-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2024-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2024-02-15HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Water
2024-02-08HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 8, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 218-N
2024-02-05HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Water
2024-02-05HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback