KS HB2677 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to disclosure of contents of communication while in electronic storage.
Title
Relating to disclosure of contents of communication while in electronic storage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-25 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2014-02-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-13 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/hb2677/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hb2677_00_0000.pdf |