KS HB2672 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing transferable landowner appreciation permits for the hunting of white-tailed deer and allowing one landowner appreciation permit for every contiguous 80 deeded acres of land owned, up to two permits, for a fee of not to exceed $25.
Title
Establishing transferable landowner appreciation permits for the hunting of white-tailed deer and allowing one landowner appreciation permit for every contiguous 80 deeded acres of land owned, up to two permits, for a fee of not to exceed $25.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Budget |
2024-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 118-N |
2024-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Budget |
2024-02-01 | House | House Introduced |