KS HB2639 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing KDHE to collect a fee for fingerprinting individuals maintaining or residing, working or regularly volunteering at a child care facility.
Title
Allowing KDHE to collect a fee for fingerprinting individuals maintaining or residing, working or regularly volunteering at a child care facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 110 Nay: 11 (Y: 110 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 4 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 111 Nay: 6 (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 36 Nay: 4 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 111 Nay: 6 (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-06 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 06, 2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, April 2, 2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 110 Nay: 11 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 36 Nay: 4 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 118-N |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-22 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 111 Nay: 6 |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Children and Seniors |
2018-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 08, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 218-N |
2018-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2018-02-06 | House | House Introduced |