KS HB2634 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an additional corrective control provision for the chief engineer to consider when issuing orders of designations for local enhanced managements areas and intensive groundwater use control areas.
Title
Providing an additional corrective control provision for the chief engineer to consider when issuing orders of designations for local enhanced managements areas and intensive groundwater use control areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 144-S |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-02-28 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, February 26, 2024 |
2024-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Water |
2024-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 6, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2024-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Water |
2024-01-30 | House | House Introduced |