KS HB2632 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 12 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 12 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning economic development financing programs; tax increment financing; STAR bond financing act; Kansas bioscience authority assets sale authorization.
Title
Concerning economic development financing programs; tax increment financing; STAR bond financing act; Kansas bioscience authority assets sale authorization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 89 Nay: 32 (Y: 89 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 1 (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 1 (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 12 , 2016 |
2016-06-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 09, 2016 |
2016-05-01 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, May 02 , 2016 |
2016-05-01 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 89 Nay: 32 |
2016-05-01 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-04-28 | House | House Representative Sawyer replaces Representative Houston on the Conference Committee |
2016-04-28 | House | House Representative Suellentrop replaces Representative Kelly on the Conference Committee |
2016-04-28 | House | House Representative Kleeb replaces Representative Schwab on the Conference Committee |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Senator Kelly replaces Senator Hawk on the Conference Committee |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Senator Denning replaces Senator Bowers on the Conference Committee |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Senator Masterson replaces Senator Longbine on the Conference Committee |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Bowers and Senator Hawk appointed as conferees |
2016-03-22 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Schwab , Representative Kelly and Representative Houston as conferees |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Longbine was adopted |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Longbine |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2016, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2016-02-23 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 1 |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2016-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2016-02-12 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 18, 2016, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2016-02-09 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on General Government Budget; Referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2016-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on General Government Budget |
2016-02-08 | House | House Introduced |