KS HB2631 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the career technical education credential and transition incentive for employment success act to provide additional state aid for school districts based on students obtaining a credential.
Title
Enacting the career technical education credential and transition incentive for employment success act to provide additional state aid for school districts based on students obtaining a credential.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected - Yea: 57 Nay: 62 (Y: 57 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-03-22 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected - Yea: 57 Nay: 62 (Y: 57 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-03-28 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 23, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-03-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected Yea: 57 Nay: 62 |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Huebert was adopted |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Huebert |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2022-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 8, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 218-N |
2022-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-08 | House | House Introduced |