KS HB2623 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utilities and electric transmission lines.
Title
Utilities and electric transmission lines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in Committee |
2016-02-05 | House | House Hearing: Friday, February 12, 2016, 9:00 AM Room 582-N |
2016-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Energy and Environment |
2016-02-04 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hb2623/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2623_00_0000.pdf |