KS HB2615 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 13 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 13 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the licensure and regulation of certain health care providers.
Title
Relating to the licensure and regulation of certain health care providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 115 Nay: 7 (Y: 115 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 13 , 2016 |
2016-06-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 09, 2016 |
2016-05-01 | House | House Reengrossed on Monday, May 02 , 2016 |
2016-05-01 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 115 Nay: 7 |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2016-05-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Hawkins, Representative Dove and Representative Ward appointed as fourth conferees |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator O'Donnell, Senator Bowers and Senator Kelly appointed as fourth conferees |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator O'Donnell, Senator Bowers and Senator Kelly appointed as third conferees |
2016-04-29 | House | House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Hawkins, Representative Dove and Representative Ward appointed as third conferees |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2016-04-28 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Hawkins, Representative Dove and Representative Ward appointed as second conferees |
2016-04-28 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator O'Donnell, Senator Bowers and Senator Kelly appointed as second conferees |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator O'Donnell, Senator Bowers and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees |
2016-03-21 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Hawkins , Representative Dove and Representative Ward as conferees |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 118-N |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2016-03-02 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 24 , 2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2016-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 11, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2016-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-02-04 | House | House Introduced |