KS HB2614 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 69-30)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 04 April 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 69-30)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 04 April 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the junction between I-70 and US 183 as the CW2 Bryan J. Nichols fallen veterans memorial interchange.
Title
Designating the junction between I-70 and US 183 as the CW2 Bryan J. Nichols fallen veterans memorial interchange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 3 (Y: 121 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 3 (Y: 121 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 04 April 2012 | |
2012-03-30 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 30, 2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-19 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-03-19 | Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar | |
2012-03-15 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 152-S | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-23 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-23 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 3 | |
2012-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-02-17 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 783 Docking | |
2012-02-03 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced |