KS HB2610 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an income tax subtraction modification for sales of property subject to eminent domain.
Title
Providing an income tax subtraction modification for sales of property subject to eminent domain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation |
2024-02-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2024-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2024-01-25 | House | House Introduced |