KS HB2598 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the no taxpayer funding for abortion act; amending statutes concerning late-term abortion restrictions.
Title
Creating the no taxpayer funding for abortion act; amending statutes concerning late-term abortion restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died on Calendar | |
2012-03-16 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-02-02 | Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 346-S | |
2012-02-02 | Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 346-S | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-02-01 | Introduced |